02/24/2012
Itau Lures Corcoran From UBS to Head Bond Syndication Group
Corcoran, who replaces Surat Maheshwari, will start in mid- March, said Douglas Chen, head of international fixed-income distribution at Itau
02/24/2012
Corcoran, who replaces Surat Maheshwari, will start in mid- March, said Douglas Chen, head of international fixed-income distribution at Itau
02/24/2012
The co-head of the global real estate group at Citigroup Inc.’s private banking unit, resigned.
02/24/2012
Nathalie is a French lawyer and joined LG Monaco in 2008 after 18 years working with the French and Monegasque banking and financial authorities.
02/23/2012
Mr. Hawkins and Mr. Greaves will be based out of Conning's London office reporting to Russell Busst, European Chief Investment Officer for Conning.
02/23/2012
He was the CEO of Barclays Bank (Suisse) S.A. and has previously worked for global financial institutions such as Bankers Trust Company, Credit Agricole and Citicorp, in three different continents.
02/23/2012
He will oversee a team of seven investment advisers and will be responsible for “substantially increasing” the revenue of Grant Thornton’s London team by 2015.
02/23/2012
JM Finn & Co has lured a quartet of senior investment managers from Brewin Dolphin for its London office.
02/23/2012
She was previously at Credo Capital, the private client wealth manager, where she was chairman of the group's investment committee.
02/23/2012
Prior to joining First Republic he worked for US Trust for 23 years, most recently as Managing Director and Private Client Advisor.
02/22/2012
Kiefer has been a successful advisor at UBS in the Boston area serving non-profit organizations, philanthropic high-net-worth clients, health care professionals and career professionals in the sports industry.
02/22/2012
He had been in the role since January 2010, and had responsibility for implementing the company's key strategic initiatives and projects.
02/22/2012
BNY Mellon wealth management expands team
02/21/2012
She brings with her over 20 years’ experience in the Financial Services industry having held a number of senior roles including most recently Regional Account Director at SunGard Global Trading and Deputy Managing Director, Asia Pacific at FTSE.
02/20/2012
He joined Manulife last month to help develop products for Manulife's new business unit that will specifically cater to high-net-worth clients - those with at least C$1 million to invest. He declined to provide more details about the new busi
02/20/2012
Morton is a certified financial planner and a member of the Financial Planning Association of Australia, the highest professional designation available to Australian financial planners. He also holds an Advanced Diploma in Financial Services.
02/20/2012
He has wealth of experience in international aviation and brings with him a range of skills and expertise that will enable him to empower the team to develop the brand and further boost our market share in the region."
02/20/2012
The pair will join in the second quarter, charged with developing and managing outsourcing solutions for IFAs.
02/20/2012
He replaces Austyn Tusler who left the role in November last year ahead of joining Lloyd's syndicate Barbican.
02/17/2012
A former attorney with ShawPittman, and a CPA with PricewaterhouseCoopers and Ernst & Young's National Tax Department,
02/17/2012
Harcourt’s Chief Risk Officer, Frédéric Berney, has announced that he will be leaving the company on May 31 of this year.